Assembly | 01/29/2018 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 26. Page 3865.). | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2018 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2018 | From inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2018 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2017 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 9). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |