|
07/31/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 153, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2077.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1378.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|