Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2017 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |