|
09/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 230, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2753.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2130.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1395.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|