|
09/29/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 378, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 4. Page 3515.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3507.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2963.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|