Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2017 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2017 | Read first time. To print. |