California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1520 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 6, 2017
Bill September 1, 2017
Bill July 17, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017