California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1521 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2017

Amended

Bill July 13, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017