|
09/05/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 247, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6365.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3867.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2018
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3715.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|