|
07/16/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6027.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5957.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4821.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1527.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|