California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 14, 2018
Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 7, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017