California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2017

Amended

Bill September 1, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017