California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Amended

Bill May 23, 2018
Bill January 22, 2018
Bill January 4, 2018
Bill September 12, 2017