|
10/13/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3307.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2695.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1844.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|