|
10/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 562, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3457.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2849.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 2061.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|