Senate | 09/13/2017 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez. | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/19/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 19). | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1387.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2017 | Read first time. To print. |