Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2018
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3717.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Levine.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Levine.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|