Senate | 09/11/2017 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2017 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). | ||
Senate | 06/14/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 33. Page 2086.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1418.) | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |