|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3426.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2912.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1859.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|