Assembly | 02/01/2018 | Died on third reading file. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 18). | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 12/06/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. | ||
Assembly | 12/05/2016 | Read first time. To print. |