Senate
|
09/16/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 1976.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|