California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1604 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill June 28, 2017
Bill May 16, 2017