|
07/31/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 156, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2569.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2025.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1619.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|