|
07/31/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2569.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2022.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Measure version as amended on June 12 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1613.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|