|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 939, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6873.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5594.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 2075.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|