|
09/27/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 3025.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2476.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1790.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|