California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1637 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 14, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill August 22, 2017
Bill July 10, 2017
Bill May 15, 2017
Bill May 3, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017