Senate | 06/14/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2077.) | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |