Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1620.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|