|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3208.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 2573.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 1948.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|