Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wilk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1486.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|