|
10/08/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3362.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2741.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2230.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1620.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|