California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1711 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/06/2017

                    Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1711Introduced by Committee on Veterans AffairsMarch 06, 2017 An act to add Section 19771.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1711, Committee on Veterans Affairs. State military reserve personnel: leave benefits.Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.

 Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1711Introduced by Committee on Veterans AffairsMarch 06, 2017 An act to add Section 19771.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1711, Committee on Veterans Affairs. State military reserve personnel: leave benefits.Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 18, 2017

Enrolled  July 06, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  May 18, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 1711

Introduced by Committee on Veterans AffairsMarch 06, 2017

Introduced by Committee on Veterans Affairs
March 06, 2017

 An act to add Section 19771.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1711, Committee on Veterans Affairs. State military reserve personnel: leave benefits.

Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.

Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.

This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.

SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.

19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.

19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.



19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.