|
07/21/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 93, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:40 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1845.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1396.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|