California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1726 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 20, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2017

Amended

Bill July 6, 2017
Bill June 13, 2017