Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |