07/09/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2018. | |||
07/09/2018 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/26/2018 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4825.). | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4066.) | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2018 | Read first time. To print. |