California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2017

Amended

Bill August 30, 2017
Bill August 28, 2017