Assembly | 04/26/2018 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2018 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2018 | Read first time. To print. |