|
08/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 6239.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 5232.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 5246.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|