|
07/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4898.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|