Assembly | 06/06/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2018 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2018 | Read first time. To print. |