California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1762 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 21, 2018
Bill July 2, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018
Bill February 28, 2018