Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2018 | Read first time. To print. |