|
09/08/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 6878.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 5882.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 24. Page 5545.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|