|
07/18/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4789.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|