California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1792 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2018

Amended

Bill August 16, 2018
Bill August 7, 2018
Bill June 21, 2018
Bill May 10, 2018
Bill March 19, 2018