|
07/09/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4880.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4898.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|