|
06/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 5813.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4676.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5102.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|