Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1923.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|